AZ SB1643 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Attorney fees; costs; recovery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney fees; costs; recovery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-11SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12341.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12348Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback