AZ SB1628 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sex-based terms; laws; rules; regulations
Title
Sex-based terms; laws; rules; regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Governor Vetoed | |
2024-04-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2024-03-06 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administrative Rules
Arizona Women's Bill Of Rights
Definitions
General Provisions - Title 1
Laws
Public Policies
Purpose
Regulation (h)
Regulations
Rules
Severability
Sex Discrimination
Sex-based Terms
Short Title (h)
Single-sex Environments
Statutes
Use Of The Term Sex
Vital Statistics Related To Sex
Arizona Women's Bill Of Rights
Definitions
General Provisions - Title 1
Laws
Public Policies
Purpose
Regulation (h)
Regulations
Rules
Severability
Sex Discrimination
Sex-based Terms
Short Title (h)
Single-sex Environments
Statutes
Use Of The Term Sex
Vital Statistics Related To Sex