AZ SB1608 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic applications; human smuggling
Title
Electronic applications; human smuggling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Classification
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definition
Definitions
Electronic Applications
Human Smuggling
Smuggling
Strike Everything Amendment
Unlawful Use Of An Electronic Device To Smuggle
Using Electronic Device To Smuggle
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definition
Definitions
Electronic Applications
Human Smuggling
Smuggling
Strike Everything Amendment
Unlawful Use Of An Electronic Device To Smuggle
Using Electronic Device To Smuggle