AZ SB1578 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Court-ordered treatment; substance abuse
Title
Court-ordered treatment; substance abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Considerations
Contents
Court-ordered Treatment
Criteria
Definition
Definitions
Dismissal
Duties Of The Court
Emergency Involuntary Treatment
Evaluation
Evaluations
Failure To Attend Evaluation
Guarantee For Costs Of Treatment
Hearing
Involuntary Treatment
Matthew Casey Wethington Act For Substance Abuse Intervention
Petition For Involuntary Treatment
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rights Of Patient
Screening
Short Title (h)
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder
Summons
Transportation To Behavioral Health Facility
Transportation To Hospital
Contents
Court-ordered Treatment
Criteria
Definition
Definitions
Dismissal
Duties Of The Court
Emergency Involuntary Treatment
Evaluation
Evaluations
Failure To Attend Evaluation
Guarantee For Costs Of Treatment
Hearing
Involuntary Treatment
Matthew Casey Wethington Act For Substance Abuse Intervention
Petition For Involuntary Treatment
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rights Of Patient
Screening
Short Title (h)
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder
Summons
Transportation To Behavioral Health Facility
Transportation To Hospital
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 521.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |