AZ SB1572 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona promise scholarship program; appropriation
Title
Arizona promise scholarship program; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Reports
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Arizona Board Of Regents
Arizona Promise Scholarship
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Eligibility
Financial Aid Trust Fund
Fund
Program Termination
Programs
Scholarships
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Arizona Board Of Regents
Arizona Promise Scholarship
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Eligibility
Financial Aid Trust Fund
Fund
Program Termination
Programs
Scholarships