AZ SB1563 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workforce; study committee; report
Title
Workforce; study committee; report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 72 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-04-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-15-3-0) |
2023-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishing
Establishing A Program
Joint Legislative New American Talent Study Committee
Membership
New American Talent Study Committee
Report
Reports
Requirements
Study Committee
Study Committee Coordinator
Workforce
Duties
Establishing
Establishing A Program
Joint Legislative New American Talent Study Committee
Membership
New American Talent Study Committee
Report
Reports
Requirements
Study Committee
Study Committee Coordinator
Workforce