AZ SB1559 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; restitution; adoptive parents; exception
Title
Juveniles; restitution; adoptive parents; exception
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-04-04 | House Consent Calendar April 04, 2011 @ 2:10 PM | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate PSHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |