AZ SB1558 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by HB2760

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Legislators; mileage rate; distance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislators; mileage rate; distance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-27 Transmitted to Governor
2019-05-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (37-23-0-0)
2019-05-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0)
2019-05-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-05-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-05-23SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate read second time
2019-05-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-05-23SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0)

Same As/Similar To

HB2760 (Replaced by) 2019-05-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38624Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback