AZ HB2760 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1558
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislators; mileage rate; distance.
Title
Legislators; mileage rate; distance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-05-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-1-0-0-0) |
2019-05-25 | House | House read second time |
2019-05-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1558 (Replaces) 2019-06-07 - Governor Vetoed
Subjects
Department Of Administration
Legislative Per Diem
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Travel Expenses
Legislative Per Diem
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Travel Expenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |