AZ SB1555 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - House read second time
Pending: House Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - House read second time
Pending: House Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Historic names board; establishment
Title
Historic names board; establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Action
Advertising
Arizona Commerce Authority
Arizona Historical Society
Arizona State Library, Archives And Public Records
Arizona University
Board
Chairperson
Classification
Consideration
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Transportation
Establishment
Expenses
Geographic Features
Geography Department
Historic Names Board
Historic Place
Historic Road
Hoover Dam
Membership
Mogollon Rim
Names
Notice
Parkway
Perpetuation Of Historical Names
Places Of Historical Significance
Powers And Duties
Public Officers
Purpose
Quorum
Repeal
Scenic Road
Staff Support
State Agencies
State Board On Geographic And Historic Names
State Government - Title 41
State Land Department
Submission Of Proposal
Termination
Violation
Advertising
Arizona Commerce Authority
Arizona Historical Society
Arizona State Library, Archives And Public Records
Arizona University
Board
Chairperson
Classification
Consideration
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Transportation
Establishment
Expenses
Geographic Features
Geography Department
Historic Names Board
Historic Place
Historic Road
Hoover Dam
Membership
Mogollon Rim
Names
Notice
Parkway
Perpetuation Of Historical Names
Places Of Historical Significance
Powers And Duties
Public Officers
Purpose
Quorum
Repeal
Scenic Road
Staff Support
State Agencies
State Board On Geographic And Historic Names
State Government - Title 41
State Land Department
Submission Of Proposal
Termination
Violation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3020.05 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3029.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |