AZ SB1553 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; Arizona empowerment accounts.
Title
Education; Arizona empowerment accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-7-2-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | House third reading , voting: (40-19-1-0) | |
2011-04-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-09 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |