AZ SB1552 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Developmental disability providers; rates; appropriations
Title
Developmental disability providers; rates; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] |
Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Department Of Economic Security
Developmental Disabilities Service Providers
Intent Clause
Provider Rate Increases
Rates
Report
Appropriations
Department Of Economic Security
Developmental Disabilities Service Providers
Intent Clause
Provider Rate Increases
Rates
Report