AZ SB1524 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulatory actions; limitation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory actions; limitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12 Chapter 209
2016-05-12 Governor Signed
2016-05-04 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-04SenateSenate final reading , voting: (18-11-1-0)
2016-05-04SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-03-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-28HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0)
2016-03-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0)
2016-03-03HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-09HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2016-03-07HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-03HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2016-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-29SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
2016-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2016-02-03SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1524
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0209.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1524smith0915.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1524petersen.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.1524commerce.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524.hcom.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1524.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback