AZ SB1522 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2660

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Capital outlay; appropriations; 2018-2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital outlay; appropriations; 2018-2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateChapter 277
2018-05-03SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-26-1-0)
2018-05-02HouseTransmit to House
2018-05-02SenateSenate third reading None voting: (16-13-1-0)
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-05-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-05-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-05-01SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0)
2018-04-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-04-30SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-04-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2660 (Replaces) 2018-05-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70937
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1522p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1522s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0277.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1522flooryarbrough.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70937&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70937&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70937&billStatusActionId=183543&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70937&billStatusActionId=183544&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70937&billStatusActionId=183595&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback