AZ SB1503 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; disabled parking; reciprocity
Title
Technical correction; disabled parking; reciprocity
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House read second time | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate GR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |