AZ SB1498 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona centennial medallions
Title
Arizona centennial medallions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | House third reading , voting: (58-1-1-0) | |
2011-04-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-08 | House read second time | |
2011-03-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-02 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |