AZ SB1490 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Cesar Chavez Boulevard
Title
Appropriation; Cesar Chavez Boulevard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DP/C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DP/C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 331 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-11-7-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: DP/C&P, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Cesar Chavez Boulevard
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Cesar Chavez Boulevard
Department Of Transportation (adot)