AZ SB1490 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 228 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 228 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation funding; task force
Title
Transportation funding; task force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Chapter 228 E | |
2016-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-4-4-0) |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |