AZ SB1488 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Federal monies; legislative appropriations
Title
Federal monies; legislative appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] |
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate Consent Calendar February 20, 2012 @ 1:20 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |