AZ SB1487 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Caregiver protections; placement provider investigation
Title
Caregiver protections; placement provider investigation
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. Travis Grantham [R] |
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Abuse
Abuse Allegation
Caregivers
Child Safety
Child Safety - Title 8
Dcs
Department Of Child Safety
Foster Home
Protection
Training
Abuse Allegation
Caregivers
Child Safety
Child Safety - Title 8
Dcs
Department Of Child Safety
Foster Home
Protection
Training
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 517.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 517.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |