AZ SB1482 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appellate judges; judicial performance reviews
Title
Appellate judges; judicial performance reviews
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (41-18-1-0) | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-02 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |