AZ SB1480 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Executive officers; salaries
Title
Executive officers; salaries
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Fernandez [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Sen. Priya Sundareshan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Absence From State
Assistants
Attestation Of Acts Of Governor
Attorney General
Exceptions
Executive Officer Salaries
Executive Officers
Fees
Office
Outside Counsel
Powers And Duties
Qualifications
Salaries
Salary
Seal
State Government - Title 41
Assistants
Attestation Of Acts Of Governor
Attorney General
Exceptions
Executive Officer Salaries
Executive Officers
Fees
Office
Outside Counsel
Powers And Duties
Qualifications
Salaries
Salary
Seal
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 121.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |