AZ SB1477 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Political bias; grade challenge department
Title
Political bias; grade challenge department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-3-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Abor (see Also: Arizona Board Of Regents)
Appeals
Arizona Board Of Regents (abor)
Definition
Education - Title 15
Grade Challenge Board
Grade Challenge Department
Political Bias
Appeals
Arizona Board Of Regents (abor)
Definition
Education - Title 15
Grade Challenge Board
Grade Challenge Department
Political Bias