AZ SB1476 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electromagnetic pulse preparedness; recommendations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electromagnetic pulse preparedness; recommendations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-25 Chapter 236
2014-04-25 Governor Signed
2014-04-24 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-23SenateSenate final reading , voting: (25-1-4-0)
2014-04-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-17HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-04-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (39-17-4-0)
2014-04-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-04-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2014-03-13HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-03-19HouseHouse PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2014-03-17HouseReferred to House PSMRA Committee
2014-03-17HouseHouse read second time
2014-03-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-03-13HouseAssigned to House PSMRA Committee
2014-03-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2014-03-06SenateTransmit to House
2014-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0)
2014-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-03-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-03SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-05SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-12SenateSenate PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2014-02-05SenateReferred to Senate PS Committee
2014-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate PS Committee
2014-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=SB1476
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476c.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/laws/0236.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.14761255.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.1476ps.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.1476br.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/51leg/2r/s.1476959.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.sps.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.hpsmra.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.sfinal.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1476.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback