AZ SB1465 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Distributed energy generation systems; disclosure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributed energy generation systems; disclosure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30 Chapter 90
2015-03-30 Governor Signed
2015-03-24 Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-24SenateSenate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0)
2015-03-24SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2015-03-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-19HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-03-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-6-0)
2015-03-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2015-03-17HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-17HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-16HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-03-03HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-09HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0)
2015-03-04HouseReferred to House EENR Committee
2015-03-04HouseHouse read second time
2015-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-03-03HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-02-26SenateTransmit to House
2015-02-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0)
2015-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-02-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-09SenateSenate WE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2015-02-04SenateReferred to Senate WE Committee
2015-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2015-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate WE Committee
2015-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=114&Bill_Number=SB1465
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/laws/0090.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/1465lesko1148.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1465-p1-clark.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1465-p1-pratt.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465.swe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465.heenr.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1465.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments 750

feedback