AZ SB1460 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; digital goods and services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; digital goods and services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2019-02-12SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-11SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425077New CodeSee Bill Text
425151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425155.01New CodeSee Bill Text
425167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426017New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback