AZ SB1458 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Speech-language pathologists; assistants
Title
Speech-language pathologists; assistants
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 250 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Advisory Committee
Assistants
Deaf (h)
Definitions (h)
Director (h)
Dispenser's License (h)
Educational Materials
Hard Of Hearing (h)
Hearing Aid Dispensers
Licensure (h)
Notice Requirements
Powers And Duties (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Health Emergencies
Reciprocity (h)
Repeal
Speech-language Pathologist
Telecommunication Technology
United States Department Of Education
Assistants
Deaf (h)
Definitions (h)
Director (h)
Dispenser's License (h)
Educational Materials
Hard Of Hearing (h)
Hearing Aid Dispensers
Licensure (h)
Notice Requirements
Powers And Duties (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Health Emergencies
Reciprocity (h)
Repeal
Speech-language Pathologist
Telecommunication Technology
United States Department Of Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1910 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1925 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1940 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1940.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1940.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |