AZ SB1454 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; incentive program; dual enrollment
Title
Schools; incentive program; dual enrollment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
College Credits
Community College District Boards
Department Of Education
Dual Enrollment
Education - Title 15
High Schools
Incentives
School Instruction
Schools
Community College District Boards
Department Of Education
Dual Enrollment
Education - Title 15
High Schools
Incentives
School Instruction
Schools
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |