AZ SB1450 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - House HEALTH Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - House HEALTH Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Return to out-of-home care; placement
Title
Return to out-of-home care; placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Child Safety
Child Welfare And Placement
Department Of Child Safety
Foster Families
Placement
Return To Out-of-home Care
Child Welfare And Placement
Department Of Child Safety
Foster Families
Placement
Return To Out-of-home Care