AZ SB1450 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Banks; insuring organization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banks; insuring organization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09 Governor Vetoed
2015-04-02 Transmitted to Governor
2015-04-02SenateSenate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0)
2015-04-02SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2015-04-01SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-04-01SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-31HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-03-31HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0)
2015-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-03-12HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-25HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-4-0-1-0)
2015-03-17HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2015-03-17HouseHouse BFS Committee action: Withdrawn
2015-03-16HouseReferred to House BFS Committee
2015-03-16HouseHouse read second time
2015-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-03-17HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2015-03-12HouseAssigned to House BFS Committee
2015-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-02-23SenateTransmit to House
2015-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2015-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-02-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-11SenateSenate FI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2015-02-04SenateReferred to Senate FI Committee
2015-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2015-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate FI Committee
2015-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=114&Bill_Number=SB1450
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/s.1450102.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/s.1450fi.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1450-p1-olson.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/h.1450-se-approp.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450.sfi.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450.happrop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1450.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback