AZ SB1443 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Photo enforcement procedures
Title
Photo enforcement procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Rebecca Rios [D] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-04-28 | House majority caucus: Hold | |
2010-04-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (17-12-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |