AZ SB1438 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Fantasy sports competitions; definition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fantasy sports competitions; definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-06SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2020-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback