AZ SB1422 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Universities; tuition and fees
Title
Universities; tuition and fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 107 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2018-03-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-03-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-12 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-1-0-0) |
2018-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |