AZ SB1420 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2458

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Consular identification; validity; biometric verification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consular identification; validity; biometric verification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateChapter 42
2021-03-05SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-01SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-18-1-0)
2021-02-24HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0)
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-01-28SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-27SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2458 (Replaces) 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
415001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75464
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1420p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1420s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0042.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.14200950.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1420ed.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484118
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484619
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485899
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486128
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486544
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487204
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488169
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75464&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75464&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75464&billStatusActionId=201696&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75464&billStatusActionId=201698&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75464&billStatusActionId=201738&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback