AZ SB1419 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dental hygienists; community oral health
Title
Dental hygienists; community oral health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (27-1-2-0) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (36-20-4-0) | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate HEALTH Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |