AZ SB1409 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning ordinances; property rights; costs
Title
Zoning ordinances; property rights; costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 358 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-21-0-0) |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Cost
Costs
Definitions (h)
Housing
Municipal Zoning
Municipality (h)
Property Rights
Public Hearings (h)
Regulations (h)
Zoning Ordinances
Cost
Costs
Definitions (h)
Housing
Municipal Zoning
Municipality (h)
Property Rights
Public Hearings (h)
Regulations (h)
Zoning Ordinances