AZ SB1408 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Luxury privilege tax; credit
Title
Luxury privilege tax; credit
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Craft Distiller
Credit
Credits (h)
Farm Winery
Luxury Privilege Tax
Microbrewery
Taxation - Title 42
Craft Distiller
Credit
Credits (h)
Farm Winery
Luxury Privilege Tax
Microbrewery
Taxation - Title 42