AZ SB1408 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of guardianship or conservatorship
Title
Transfer of guardianship or conservatorship
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-22 | House read second time | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |