AZ SB1406 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public accommodation; exemptions; enforcement; sanctions
Title
Public accommodation; exemptions; enforcement; sanctions
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 175 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-2-0) |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committed Youth
Committee
Contribution
County Contributions
Juvenile Corrections And Justice Reform Study Committee
Monies
Repeal
State Government
Committed Youth
Committee
Contribution
County Contributions
Juvenile Corrections And Justice Reform Study Committee
Monies
Repeal
State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1492.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1492.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1492.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2832 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2833 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |