AZ SB1404 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offender registration; school notification
Title
Sex offender registration; school notification
Sponsors
Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Sen. Brian Fernandez [D] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 57 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-1-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-11 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Assessment
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Forwarding Of Information
Identification Card
Persons Required To Register
Procedure
School
School Notification
Sex Offender Registration
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Forwarding Of Information
Identification Card
Persons Required To Register
Procedure
School
School Notification
Sex Offender Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |