AZ SB1402 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health care; costs; reimbursement
Title
Health care; costs; reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Charges
Costs
Definitions
Direct Payment
Disclosure
Health Care
Health Care Providers
Health Care Services
Health Insurers
Insurance - Title 20
Notice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Availability
Reimbursement
Savings Incentive Programs
Costs
Definitions
Direct Payment
Disclosure
Health Care
Health Care Providers
Health Care Services
Health Insurers
Insurance - Title 20
Notice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Availability
Reimbursement
Savings Incentive Programs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |