AZ SB1402 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - House third reading FAILED voting: (17-39-3-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - House third reading FAILED voting: (17-39-3-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Class six property; higher education.
Title
Class six property; higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (17-39-3-1) |
2016-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-04-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-2-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |