AZ SB1402 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - Referred to House EENR Committee
Pending: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - Referred to House EENR Committee
Pending: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy; definition
Title
Renewable energy; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |