AZ SB1399 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board of barbers; cosmetology; apprenticeships

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of barbers; cosmetology; apprenticeships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateChapter 274
2018-05-02SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-26SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0)
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32512.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70566
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1399p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1399s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1399h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0274.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1399rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1399smith0817.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70566&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70566&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=180665&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=180879&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70566&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70566&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=183109&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=183350&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=183355&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=183387&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70566&billStatusActionId=183391&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback