AZ SB1398 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Photo enforcement; DPS equipment fund
Title
Photo enforcement; DPS equipment fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (20-10-0-0) | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (38-22-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-1-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-16 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-03-01 | House read second time | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |