AZ SB1393 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of state; elections; lobbyists
Title
Secretary of state; elections; lobbyists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-22 | Senate final reading , voting: (24-3-3-0) | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-14 | House third reading , voting: (53-1-6-0) | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House read second time | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-30 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-30 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |