AZ SB1389 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (20-9-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (20-9-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana fund; education programs
Title
Medical marijuana fund; education programs
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (20-9-1-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |