AZ SB1387 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Local regulations; home-based businesses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local regulations; home-based businesses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-25-3-0)
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-29HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-5-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-20HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-20HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-22HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33434.02New CodeSee Bill Text
9462.09New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70545
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1387p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1387s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1387h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1387nrew.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1387nrew.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1387livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1387appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70545&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70545&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70545&billStatusActionId=181111&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70545&billStatusActionId=181247&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70545&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70545&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70545&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70545&billStatusActionId=182962&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70545&billStatusActionId=183285&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70545&billStatusActionId=183286&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback