AZ SB1376 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; curriculum; mental health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; curriculum; mental health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-02-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-16HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2021-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15701.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75401
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1376p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1376s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482250
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485885
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486237
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75401&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75401&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75401&billStatusActionId=200700&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75401&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback