AZ SB1376 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord tenant act; personal property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord tenant act; personal property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateChapter 127
2018-04-03SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-1-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331368Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331370Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70521
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1376p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1376s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0127.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.13761229.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1376comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1376rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1376griffin0911.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1376rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70521&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70521&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70521&billStatusActionId=181108&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70521&billStatusActionId=181246&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70521&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70521&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70521&billStatusActionId=182763&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70521&billStatusActionId=182767&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback